IL SB0533 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Records Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DAYLIGHT SAVING TIME ALL YEAR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2019-11-13HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2019-11-13HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-11-13HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-11-13HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-11-13HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2019-11-13HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-11-13HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-11-13HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-11-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-11-13HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-11-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-11-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-11-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-11-12HouseArrived in House
2019-11-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-002-002
2019-11-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-11-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar
2019-11-12SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-11-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-11-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-11-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 12, 2019
2019-11-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-11-06SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-05-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2019-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2019
2019-05-01SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
2019-04-12SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51601Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback