IL SB0489 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a school district may offer a firearm safety training course to students in grades 9 through 12, which may include instruction on hunting safety. Provides that if a school district offers the course, a student may not be required to take the course. Provides that if a school board intends to offer a firearm safety training course, it must develop a policy to implement the course and must publish that policy on the district's website.
Title
SCH CD-FIREARM SAFETY COURSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Executive- Firearms |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=489&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0489.htm |