IL SB0482 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Gas Revenue Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
PTELL-EXTENSION LIMITATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2018-12-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2018-12-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2018-12-29 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - November 27, 2018 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 |
2018-05-31 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 111-001-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-05-31 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-06 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-11-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-003-000 |
2017-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-11-06 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-10-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-10-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-10-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-10-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-08-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-011-009 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 615 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |