IL SB0482 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Gas Revenue Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PTELL-EXTENSION LIMITATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-003-000
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-11-06HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-11-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-10-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-08-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-31HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-30HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-30HouseArrived in House
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-011-009
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2017-05-30SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-22SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3561515Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback