IL SB0457 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the University of Illinois Act. With regard to scholarships for children of veterans, provides that preference for scholarships shall be given to the children of veterans who were police officers or fire officers and were killed in the line of duty while employed by, or in the voluntary service of, this State or any local public entity in this State. Effective immediately.
Title
U OF I-SCHOLARSHIP-CHILD-VET
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Stadelman |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |