IL SB0455 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Rep. Edward Acevedo [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0200 |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2015-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 |
2015-05-28 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. David Harris |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion Prevailed 069-045-000 |
2015-05-28 | House | Rep. Ron Sandack Object to the Motion, requests a Roll Call |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Health Care Licenses Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-28 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2015-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-05-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2015-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Muñoz |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |