IL SB0371 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Pier and Exposition Authority Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning purchases.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 210 | 5.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=371&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0371.htm |