IL SB0269 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0616
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0616
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning the duty of the regional superintendent of schools to conduct courses of instruction for school bus drivers, allows for an increase in fees for providing such courses. Provides that, of the increase in course fees authorized, $1 shall be deposited into a State Board of Education revolving account specifically dedicated to school bus safety for the conduct of business of the Illinois Pupil Transportation Advisory Committee and the certification and conduct of educational programs and training of Illinois school bus driver instructors.
Title
SCHOOL BUS INSTRUCTION COURSES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 38 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-24 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0616 | |
2009-08-24 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-24 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-27 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 041-017-000 | |
2009-05-26 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000 | |
2009-05-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive | |
2009-05-20 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-20 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-04-28 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-037-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-22 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-005-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 009-005-000 | |
2009-04-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 050-003-000 | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2009 | |
2009-02-27 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2009 | |
2009-02-19 | Do Pass Executive; 011-001-000 | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio |