IL SB0259 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Sport Shooting and Training Range Act. Contains legislative findings and intent. Provides that the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency shall make a good faith effort to provide U. S. Environmental Protection Agency publications to owners or operators of sport shooting or training ranges and provide environmental practices assistance. Provides for environmental stewardship plans at ranges and for Illinois EPA assistance with contamination. Sets forth procedures regarding contamination investigations and corrective actions. Provides for immunity from legal actions brought by the State, local governments, persons, or non-governmental entities based upon projectiles on the range or in the environment, if an operator made a good faith effort to comply with the Environmental Protection Act. Provides for withdrawal of claims by the State and local governments against ranges pending in a State court or administrative agency. Provides for criminal penalties when a State or local governmental employee while officially acting maliciously violates the Act. Provides that no municipality or county shall zone or rezone any property that includes a range if the zoning or rezoning would cause the range to be eliminated or to cease operation, unless the owner petitions for or consents to the zoning or rezoning. Contains provisions regarding: costs; preemption; conflicting laws; construction; and other matters. Amends the Environmental Protection Act to conform to the new Act.
Title
SPORT SHOOTING RANGE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-13 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-11 | To Judiciary Subcommittee on Property and the Environment | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-03-05 | Postponed - Judiciary | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary | |
2009-03-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Rutherford | |
2009-02-25 | Postponed - Judiciary | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-02-19 | Postponed - Judiciary | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=259&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0259.htm |