IL SB0229 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1087
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1087
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clean Coal FutureGen for Illinois Act of 2011. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
GUBERNATORIAL BDS-DEMOGRAPHIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1087 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William Delgado |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2014-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2014-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-05-21 | House | Re-assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-05-16 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2014-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Delgado |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William Delgado |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1108 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |