IL SB0219 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Great Lakes-St. Lawrence River Basin Water Resources Compact Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOTTERY-GAME-SPECIAL OLYMPICS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0649 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Effective Date June 16, 2014 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 007-001-000 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 20, 2014 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-011-000 |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-05-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-002-000 |
2014-05-08 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-08 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-001-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2014-05-01 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2014-04-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-002-000 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 147 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |