IL SB0217 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-28 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-28 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill. Reinserts the provisions of House Amendment No. 1, but removes provisions from House Amendment No. 1 concerning special purpose trust companies. Provides that the changes to the Property Tax Code in House Amendment No. 1 concerning educational trade schools apply only in a county with a population of more than 3,000,000 inhabitants and a county with a population of more than 600,000 inhabitants but not more than 700,000 inhabitants. Effective immediately.
Title
PARKING TAX-EXEMPTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - October 28, 2021 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 |
2021-10-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-001 |
2021-10-28 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-10-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-10-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 012-000-000 |
2021-10-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-10-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-10-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-10-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-06-02 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-006-000 |
2021-03-11 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-03-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2021 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 011-000-000 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 525 | 10-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |