IL SB0197 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2023 (rather than January 1, 2022). Amends the Clerks of Courts Act. Provides that a Section concerning circuit court clerk fees is repealed on January 1, 2023 (rather than January 1, 2022). Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM&TRAFFIC ASSESSMENT-REPEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 105 | 27.1b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 135 | 20-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=197&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0197.htm |