IL SB0154 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits unlawful use of an animal (currently, this provision only covers elephants) in a traveling animal act when he or she knowingly allows for the participation of an animal in a traveling animal act. Unlawful use of an animal in a traveling animal act is a Class A misdemeanor. Defines "animal". Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
CRIM CD-TRAVELING ANIMALS
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] |
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Laura Ellman [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 006-005-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 48-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=154&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0154.htm |