IL SB0148 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Exempts policy-making employees from the definition of "public employee" and from the right to organize and bargain collectively. Defines a "policy-making employee" as one (i) with principal administrative responsibilities for the making of policy or for the way in which policy is carried out or (ii) whose position is otherwise exempt from the requirements of the Rutan decision.
Title
PUBLIC LABOR-POLICY EMPLOYEES
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-03 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on State Government Operations; - 3/16/2011 - Held |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=148&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB0148.htm |