IL SB0144 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that none of the amount received by an individual as primary social security old age and disability retirement benefits shall constitute disqualifying income.
Title
UNEMPLOY INS-SOCIAL SECURITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzi Schmidt |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 8, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2011-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 405 | 611 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=144&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB0144.htm |