IL SB0112 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Requires the Board of Higher Education to establish a Big Ten Feasibility Study Commission to deliberate and determine the feasibility of having another public university in this State become a part of the Big Ten Conference and how this might be accomplished, while remaining revenue neutral to this State. Sets forth the membership of the Commission, and provides that members shall serve without compensation and without reimbursement for their expenses. Requires the Commission to meet within 90 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, to hold public hearings, to invite witnesses of interest, to take testimony, and to file a report with the General Assembly and the Board on or before January 1, 2016. Dissolves the Commission upon filing of the report, and repeals these provisions on January 1, 2017. Effective immediately.
Title
BD HIGHER ED-BIG 10 COMMISSION
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |