IL SB0087 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearms Restraining Order Act. Provides that a State's Attorney or assistant State's Attorney (rather than a petitioner) may request an emergency firearms restraining order by filing an affidavit or verified pleading alleging that the respondent poses an immediate and present danger of causing personal injury to himself, herself, or another by having in his or her custody or control, purchasing, possessing, or receiving a firearm. Provides that if the court issues an emergency firearms restraining order, it shall, based upon written application filed by the State's Attorney or assistant State's Attorney supported by evidence submitted under oath or affirmation, upon a finding of probable cause that the respondent possesses firearms, issue a search warrant directing a law enforcement agency to seize the respondent's firearms. Provides that an emergency firearms restraining order and a 6-month firearms restraining order shall require the firearm or firearms and Firearm Owner's Identification Card and concealed carry license, if unexpired, to be returned to the respondent if the firearms restraining order is not granted within 7 days. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM RESTRAINING ORDERS
Sponsors
Sen. Win Stoller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Executive- Firearms |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Win Stoller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 67 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 67 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=87&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0087.htm |