IL SB0079 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Charter Schools Law of the School Code. Establishes a State Charter School Commission as an independent State agency with statewide chartering jurisdiction and authority, consisting of 9 members appointed by the State Board of Education on the recommendation of a slate of candidates proposed by the Governor. Provides that the Commission is responsible for authorizing high-quality charter schools throughout this State. Allows the Commission to charge a charter school that it authorizes a fee, not to exceed 3% of the revenue provided to the school, to cover the cost of undertaking the ongoing administrative responsibilities of the eligible chartering authority with respect to the school. Provides that any charter school authorized by the State Board prior to the amendatory Act shall have its authorization transferred immediately to the Commission, which shall then become the school's authorizer. Provides that any charter school authorized by a school board may seek approval from the Commission during its current term only with the approval of the school board, and provides that at the end of its charter term, a charter school authorized by a school board must reapply to that board before it may apply for authorization to the Commission. Makes additional changes concerning the Commission, and makes changes concerning authorizers, immunity, the submission of information, and reporting. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-ST CHARTER SCHOOL COMM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0152 |
2011-07-20 | Senate | Effective Date July 20, 2011 |
2011-07-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-006-001 |
2011-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-05-05 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2011-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2011-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2011-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell |
2011-04-27 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-001 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000 |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 009-000-000 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27A-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-7.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-7.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |