IL SB0077 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that as a condition of initial eligibility for medical assistance benefits provided under the State's Medical Assistance program or, subject to federal approval, benefits provided under the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP), an applicant must pass a drug screening. Provides that as a condition of continued eligibility for such benefits, a recipient must pass random drug screenings as prescribed by the Department of Human Services. Requires the Department to adopt rules requiring applicants for TANF benefits or SNAP benefits to actively seek work in order to qualify for such benefits. Provides that the rules adopted by the Department shall be in compliance with those rules under the Unemployment Insurance Act and adopted by the Department of Employment Security requiring unemployed individuals to actively seek employment in order to qualify for unemployment insurance benefits. Requires the Department to adopt rules that allow recipients of TANF benefits or SNAP benefits to experience a gradual reduction in benefits as earnings increase. Increases the penalties for using another person's cash assistance benefits or SNAP benefits. Contains provisions requiring photo identification when using a LINK card to obtain SNAP benefits or cash. Provides that no recipient of TANF benefits shall use his or her benefits to purchase lottery tickets or to patronize any casino or licensed establishment that operates video gaming terminals for the purpose of engaging in gambling or video gaming activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-SNAP-DRUG TEST-LINK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS)
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-12SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-12SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30551-10.5New CodeSee Bill Text
30551-10.6New CodeSee Bill Text
305512-4.4aNew CodeSee Bill Text
305512-4.4bNew CodeSee Bill Text
30554-8aNew CodeSee Bill Text
30558A-4BNew CodeSee Bill Text
30558A-5AAmended CodeCitation Text
30558A-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback