IL SB0066 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Provides that a supplier shall permanently affix its name or a distinctive logo or other mark or design element identifying the manufacturer or supplier (was, its name) to all its equipment, devices, and supplies for gambling operations. Provides an exception for gaming chips without a value impressed, engraved, or imprinted on it. Allows the Board to waive the requirement for any specific product or products if it determines that the requirement is not necessary to protect the integrity of the game. Provides that items purchased from a licensed supplier may continue to be used even though the supplier subsequently changes its name, distinctive logo, or other mark or design element; undergoes a change in ownership; or ceases to be licensed as a supplier for any reason. Effective immediately
Title
RIVERBOATS-SUPPLIERS-CHIPS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-12-20 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-12-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2013-12-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2013-12-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2013-12-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2013-12-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2013-12-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2013-12-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2013-12-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2013-12-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2013-12-02 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2013-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2013-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-11-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-11-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-11-27 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-11-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 20, 2013 |
2013-11-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2013-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-11-05 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-11-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-11-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-11-05 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2013-11-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-11-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2013-11-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-11-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2013-10-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-10-16 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2013-10-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-10-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2013 |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2013-03-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2013 |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Terry Link |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 10 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |