IL SB0057 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986 and the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that, with exceptions, the court may, upon request by a petitioner for an order of protection, order a wireless telephone service provider to transfer to the petitioner the right to continue to use a telephone number or numbers indicated by the petitioner and the financial responsibility associated with the number or numbers. Provides that the petitioner may request transfer of each telephone number that the petitioner, or a minor child in his or her custody, uses. Provides that the order shall contain specified terms. Provides that a wireless telephone service provider may apply to the petitioner its routine and customary requirements for establishing an account or transferring a number, including requiring the petitioner to provide proof of identification, financial information, and customer preferences. Provides that a wireless telephone service provider is immune from civil liability for its actions taken in compliance with a court order issued under the new provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROTECTION ORDER-PHONE SERVICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
2017-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
2017-05-17HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-05-17HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-10HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-02-16SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-02-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-02-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-02-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-02-09SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2016-12-28SenatePrefiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255112A-14Amended CodeCitation Text
75060214Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=57&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0057.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0057eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0057enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0057sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0057sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0057ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0057ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0057_04272017_090000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0057_05302017_054000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0057_05312017_081000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback