IL SB0050 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides the annual training of police chiefs must include at least one course on the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act, the Firearm Concealed Carry Act, and firearms investigations. Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Permits the State Police to notify the FBI if a person on the Terrorist Watchlist applies for a FOID card. Requires the State Police to provide notice and reason for the disqualification of a firearm purchase or a FOID card revocation to all law enforcement agencies with jurisdiction to assist with the seizure of the person's FOID card. Adds as grounds to deny an application for or to revoke or seize the person's FOID card that the person is charged with making a terrorist threat or soliciting or providing material support for terrorism. Makes other changes. Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that a person may not carry a concealed handgun equipped with a silencer. Amends the Wildlife Code. Removes the prohibition on using a silencer to mute the sound resulting from firing a gun. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the offense of unlawful use of weapons includes knowingly: using, or possessing with the intent to use, a silencer on a handgun, except at a shooting range; or possessing any silencer for firearms, other than handguns, not in compliance with the National Firearms Act. Provides that the offense of unlawful sale or delivery of firearms includes knowingly transferring a silencer to a person not authorized to possess the silencer under federal law. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOID CARD-REVOCATION-SILENCER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-01-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430651.1Amended CodeCitation Text
430653.1Amended CodeCitation Text
430653.3Amended CodeCitation Text
430658Amended CodeCitation Text
430659.5Amended CodeCitation Text
4306665Amended CodeCitation Text
5070510.7Amended CodeCitation Text
52052.33Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback