IL SB0050 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on July 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on July 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Allows veterans that are Illinois residents to obtain an Illinois Hunter Education card after completing the online study section of the Illinois Hunter Education program and providing the Department of Natural Resources with verification of service or mobilization. Effective immediately.
Title
HUNTING LICENSES FOR VETERANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0118 |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date July 30, 2013 |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Josh Harms |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000 |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-11 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-04-08 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2013-03-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 1, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 3.1-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |