IL SB0021 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Changes the name of the Act to the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Persons under 21 Years of Age and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Raises the age for whom tobacco products, electronic cigarettes, and alternative nicotine products may be sold to and possessed by from at least 18 years of age to at least 21 years of age. Defines "electronic cigarette". Repeals the Smokeless Tobacco Limitation Act. Amends various other Acts to make conforming changes. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
TOBACCO PRODUCTS-UNDER 21
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 7, 2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-004-000 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-16.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 130 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 143 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-615 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-710 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 675 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 675 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 675 | 1.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
720 | 675 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 675 | Act title | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 677 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 677 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 677 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 678 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 678 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 678 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 678 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 678 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 680 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
720 | 685 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 685 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |