IL SB0021 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Changes the name of the Act to the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Persons under 21 Years of Age and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Raises the age for whom tobacco products, electronic cigarettes, and alternative nicotine products may be sold to and possessed by from at least 18 years of age to at least 21 years of age. Defines "electronic cigarette". Repeals the Smokeless Tobacco Limitation Act. Amends various other Acts to make conforming changes. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOBACCO PRODUCTS-UNDER 21

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-02-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSecond Reading
2019-02-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 7, 2019
2019-02-06SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-004-000
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-01-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-01-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-01-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-01-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23556-16.1Amended CodeCitation Text
351306Amended CodeCitation Text
3514310-25Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-615Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-710Amended CodeCitation Text
7206750.01Amended CodeCitation Text
7206751Amended CodeCitation Text
7206751.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
7206752Amended CodeCitation Text
720675Act titleAmended CodeCitation Text
72067710Amended CodeCitation Text
72067715Amended CodeCitation Text
7206775Amended CodeCitation Text
7206781Amended CodeCitation Text
7206785Amended CodeCitation Text
7206786Amended CodeCitation Text
7206787Amended CodeCitation Text
7206788Amended CodeCitation Text
720680ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
7206852Amended CodeCitation Text
7206854Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback