IL SB0014 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Municipal and Chicago Laborers Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Makes changes to the retirement age for persons who first become participants on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Increases employee contribution for persons who first become participants on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act and makes other changes to the employee contribution rate. Provides that a person who first became a participant on or after January 1, 2011 and before the effective date may elect to be eligible for a reduced retirement age in exchange for an increase in employee contributions. Makes changes to the city's required contribution to each fund beginning in payment year 2018 and makes changes to provisions concerning employer contributions. Authorizes withholding from State grants in the case of nonpayment of the city's required contributions. Makes changes to provisions concerning felony forfeiture. Provides that if there is an injury or death for which death or disability benefits are payable, the fund may subrogate a claim made by that employee against a third party. In the Chicago Municipal Article, makes changes to the definition of "employee" and provides that a person who first becomes a city officer on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall not be eligible for the alternative annuity or alternative disability benefits. Makes other changes. Contains inseverability and severability provisions. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CHI MUNI & LABOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 063-045-002 |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-04-25 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2017-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-12 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2017-04-10 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2017-04-07 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2017-04-06 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2017-04-06 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2017-04-06 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-04-06 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2017-04-06 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-04-06 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-04-06 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-06 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-006-000 |
2017-02-08 | House | Re-assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-01-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-011-000 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 25, 2017 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 24, 2017 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 11-125.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 11-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 11-169.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 11-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 11-197.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 11-223.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 11-230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-173 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-173.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-174 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-228.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 8-243.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-244 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-244.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |