IL SB0007 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Chicago Casino Development Authority Act. Provides for the creation of the Chicago Casino Development Authority, whose duties include promotion and maintenance of a casino. Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975 and the Riverboat Gambling Act to authorize electronic gaming at race tracks (and makes conforming changes in various Acts). Further amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Makes various changes concerning Board members. Indefinitely extends the authorization for advance deposit wagering. Contains provisions concerning testing of horses at county fairs and standardbred horses. Further amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Changes the short title to the Illinois Gambling Act and changes corresponding references to the Act. Adds additional owners licenses, one of which authorizes the conduct of casino gambling in the City of Chicago. Makes changes in provisions concerning the admission tax and privilege tax. Makes other changes. Contains a severability provision. Effective immediately, but does not take effect at all unless Senate Bills 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, and 13 of the 100th General Assembly become law.
Title
GAMING-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Dave Syverson [R] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] |
Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Remains in Executive Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Executive Committee; 005-004-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-28 | House | Reported Back To Executive Committee; |
2018-05-28 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Executive Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-05-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2018-05-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-18 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Executive Committee; Rep. Rita Mayfield; - Gaming Subcommittee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-23 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-18 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-05-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-024-001 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Link |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Motion Prevailed |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Terry Link |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-026-000 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Link |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Link |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 25, 2017 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 24, 2017 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Gaming |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |