IL HR1311 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes and honors the upcoming 106th anniversary of the founding of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity.
Title
RECOGNIZES ALPHA PHI ALPHA
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] | Rep. Arthur Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-01-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-12-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2012-12-05 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2012-11-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2012-11-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2012-11-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2012-11-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2012-11-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1311&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR1311.htm |