IL HR1276 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Endorses and supports the Screen at 23 campaign and urges the Illinois Department of Public Health to endorse and support the Screen at 23 campaign's efforts to increase awareness of diabetes among Asian American communities, including using appropriate screening measures for Asian American patients, and to eliminate disparities.
Title
SCREEN AT 23-SUPPORT
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-11-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-11-20 | House | Assigned to Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee |
2018-11-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1276&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1276.htm |