IL HR1197 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes May 4, 2016 as the first Annual Illinois Foster Youth and Alumni Legislative Shadow Day.
Title
FOSTER YOUTH/ALUMNI SHADOW DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Youth & Young Adults |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Anthony |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1197&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR1197.htm |