IL HR1146 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, PJM Interconnection, LLC, and the Mid-Continent Independent Systems Operator to adopt rules and policies to ensure the continued operation of nuclear power plants in Illinois; urges the United States Environmental Protection Agency to adopt certain rules concerning the use of nuclear energy; urges State agencies to review federal greenhouse gas regulations and adopt policies to promote economic activity in Illinois; urges the examination of existing policies regarding the transmission of electricity to other states; and urges the Illinois Commerce Commission, the Illinois Power Agency, and the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to prepare reports concerning the potential impacts from the premature closure of existing nuclear power plants and to present those reports between November 15, 2014 and the adjournment sine die of the 98th General Assembly.
Title
NUCLEAR POWER PLANT CLOSURES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2014-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2014-05-29 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2014-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2014-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2014-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-05-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 016-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2014-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2014-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2014-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2014-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Environment; Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-05-23 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2014-05-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2014-05-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1146&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR1146.htm |