IL HR1072 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Stands in staunch opposition to any new state-wide property tax.
Title
OPPOSE NEW STATE PROP TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-05-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1072&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1072.htm |