IL HR0986 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-22 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-22 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the State of Illinois to launch a pilot project to establish a transitional shelter village that will support the crisis housing and health needs of people currently experiencing unsheltered homelessness.
Title
TRANSITIONAL SHELTER VILLAGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-11-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=986&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0986.htm |