IL HR0824 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Pledges eagerness of the House of Representatives to work tirelessly here in Springfield during the third full week of May 2018 to complete the work of the people of Illinois prior to Memorial Day. Urges the Speaker of the Illinois House of Representatives to recess the House for the duration of Memorial Day, May 28, 2018, and not to call the House back into session until the completion of this day of American remembrance.
Title
RECESS HOUSE - MEMORIAL DAY
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=824&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0824.htm |