IL HR0818 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the Auditor General to conduct an audit of 3 State facility cafeterias to report on the amount of food that has been disposed of and make recommendations on serving and ordering that will reduce wasted food at State facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AUDITOR GENL-WASTED FOOD AUDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-12HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 005-002-000
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback