IL HR0804 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages each school year during the week of Veterans' Day that all students in kindergarten through 8th grade attend an assembly during the school day to honor the history and importance of Veterans's Day.
Title
VETERANS DAY-SCHOOLS-HONOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-04-07 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Josh Harms |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-03-06 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 014-000-000 |
2014-02-24 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kay Hatcher |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=804&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR0804.htm |