IL HR0801 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the federal government to grant George N. Leighton's request to be buried in Arlington National Cemetery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

G. LEIGHTON ARLINGTON BURIAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-03-08HouseResolution Adopted 101-000-000
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-03-08HouseRecommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000
2018-02-14HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback