IL HR0801 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the federal government to grant George N. Leighton's request to be buried in Arlington National Cemetery.
Title
G. LEIGHTON ARLINGTON BURIAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-03-08 | House | Resolution Adopted 101-000-000 |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-03-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley |