IL HR0799 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates April 30, 2016 as Military Brat Day in Illinois.
Title
MILITARY BRAT DAY
Sponsors
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] |
Rep. John Anthony [R] | Rep. Steven Andersson [R] | Rep. Christine Winger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-03-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 020-000-000 |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2015-12-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-12-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-10-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-09-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=799&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0799.htm |