IL HR0795 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the State of Illinois to make school climate and culture a priority.
Title
SCHOOL CLIMATE AND CULTURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-18 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=795&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0795.htm |