IL HR0795 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates February 3-7, 2014 as National School Counseling Week.
Title
NAT SCH COUNSELING WEEK
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-02-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2014-02-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-02-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-02-26 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=795&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR0795.htm |