IL HR0765 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the Assyrian Genocide of 1915 as a genocide and reprehensible crime against humanity and honors the memory of the hundreds of thousands of Assyrians who were murdered during the Assyrian Genocide of 1915. Declares August 7, 2020 as "Assyrian Remembrance Day".
Title
ASSYRIAN REMEMBRANCE DAY
Sponsors
Rep. Yehiel Kalish [D] | Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=765&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0765.htm |