IL HR0730 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Chinese Communist Party to immediately stop persecuting Falun Gong practitioners, urges the U.S. government to investigate organ transplants in China, and requests the U.S. government to prohibit any doctors who performed transplants using organs harvested from Falun Gong practitioners from gaining entry into the U.S.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

U.S./FALUN GONG - CONCERNS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-26HouseResolution Adopted
2014-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2014-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2014-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes
2014-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
2014-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2014-02-19HouseRecommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 016-000-002
2014-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2014-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch
2014-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook
2014-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe
2014-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay
2014-02-18HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ron Sandack
2014-02-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack
2014-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2014-02-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer
2014-02-11HouseAssigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
2014-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-12-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback