IL HR0688 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulates the Illinois Area Agencies on Aging for its 50 years of service. Encourages all Illinois residents to recognize the invaluable contributions the Illinois Area Agencies on Aging have made to the State's senior citizens.
Title
CONGRATS-AGENCIES ON AGING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2024-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-05-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000 |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-04-15 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=688&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0688.htm |