IL HR0655 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges extreme caution in the pursuit of Amazon.com, Inc.'s new facility.
Title
AMAZON SUBSIDIES-CAUTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=655&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0655.htm |