IL HR0640 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March of 2024 as Nutrition Month.
Title
NUTRITION MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-05-02 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to Public Health Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=640&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0640.htm |