IL HR0631 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages people to give back to their local communities on Giving Tuesday in 2020.
Title
GIVING TUESDAY-SUPPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-02-05 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-12-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=631&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0631.htm |