IL HR0610 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares June 10, 2024 as FarmWeek Appreciation Day. Congratulates FarmWeek on its 50th anniversary and wishes the publication continued success.
Title
FARMWEEK APPRECIATION DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-04-02 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=610&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0610.htm |