IL HR0602 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Endorses the American Kennel Club's "Canine Good Citizen Program" and supports its efforts to promote responsible dog ownership in the State of Illinois.
Title
RECOGNIZE-CANINE GOOD CITIZEN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-26 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-10-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-09-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=602&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0602.htm |